|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5902.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4445.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4785.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|