LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1851
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1851
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1851
Compare Versions
AB1851 Chaptered September 7, 2012
AB1851 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB1851 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1851 Amended April 24, 2012
AB1851 Amended April 10, 2012
AB1851 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1851 Chaptered September 7, 2012
AB1851 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB1851 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1851 Amended April 24, 2012
AB1851 Amended April 10, 2012
AB1851 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare