|
09/30/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 5907.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 4435.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 4561.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|