California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1852 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Amended

Bill July 3, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012