|
09/21/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 6055.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4475.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 5118.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|