California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1853 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill July 5, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012