California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1854 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2012

Amended

Bill May 3, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012