LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1854
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1854
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1854
Compare Versions
AB1854 Chaptered July 13, 2012
AB1854 Enrolled July 2, 2012
AB1854 Amended May 3, 2012
AB1854 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1854 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1854 Chaptered July 13, 2012
AB1854 Enrolled July 2, 2012
AB1854 Amended May 3, 2012
AB1854 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1854 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare