|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 813, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 6241.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 4649.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5171.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4974.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|