California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1855 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill May 7, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012