|
07/10/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 80, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4058.).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4890.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|