California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1859 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill June 26, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 10, 2012

Amended

Bill April 30, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012