California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1859 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/26/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1859ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 25, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 17, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 30, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Buchanan FEBRUARY 22, 2012 An act to add Section 12001.7 to the Education Code, relating to school facilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1859, Buchanan. School facilities: charter schools. Existing law assigns to the California School Finance Authority a specified amount of the state's 2010 federal tax credit bond volume cap for qualified school construction bonds, to be issued for the benefit of charter schools, or to be further assigned and distributed to one or more issuers in the state for the benefit of charter schools, as the California School Finance Authority determines. Existing law authorizes a charter school to apply for the federal qualified school construction bond volume cap if specified criteria are met. This bill would require a charter school, if it applies for the federal qualified school construction bond volume cap, or any other federal bond borrowing authority, to notify, in writing and at least 30 days before submitting the application, the district superintendent of schools and the governing board of the school district in which the charter school is physically located of its intent to rehabilitate, encumber, or otherwise alter school district property. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12001.7 is added to the Education Code, to read: 12001.7. Notwithstanding any other law, if a charter school applies for the federal qualified school construction bond volume cap, or any other federal bond borrowing authority, the charter school shall notify, in writing and at least 30 days before submitting the application, the district superintendent of schools and the governing board of the school district in which the charter school is physically located of its intent to rehabilitate, encumber, or otherwise alter school district property.