|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6411.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4755.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4984.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|