California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1877 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012
Bill March 19, 2012