California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1886 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2012

Amended

Bill July 5, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012