LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1886
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1886
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1886
Compare Versions
AB1886 Chaptered September 13, 2012
AB1886 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB1886 Amended July 5, 2012
AB1886 Amended June 18, 2012
AB1886 Amended April 11, 2012
AB1886 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1886 Chaptered September 13, 2012
AB1886 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB1886 Amended July 5, 2012
AB1886 Amended June 18, 2012
AB1886 Amended April 11, 2012
AB1886 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare