California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1888 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill May 22, 2012
Bill April 25, 2012