LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1888
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1888
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1888
Compare Versions
AB1888 Chaptered September 13, 2012
AB1888 Enrolled August 29, 2012
AB1888 Amended August 13, 2012
AB1888 Amended June 20, 2012
AB1888 Amended May 22, 2012
AB1888 Amended April 25, 2012
AB1888 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1888 Chaptered September 13, 2012
AB1888 Enrolled August 29, 2012
AB1888 Amended August 13, 2012
AB1888 Amended June 20, 2012
AB1888 Amended May 22, 2012
AB1888 Amended April 25, 2012
AB1888 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare