|
06/28/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 4991.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|