LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1897
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1897
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1897
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 22, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 20, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 17, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 2, 2012
Compare
Bill
April 30, 2012
Compare
Bill
April 16, 2012
Compare
Bill
March 12, 2012
Compare