California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1919 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill July 2, 2012
Bill June 13, 2012
Bill May 10, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill March 28, 2012