LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1919
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1919
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1919
Compare Versions
AB1919 Enrolled September 6, 2012
AB1919 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1919 Amended July 2, 2012
AB1919 Amended June 13, 2012
AB1919 Amended May 10, 2012
AB1919 Amended April 23, 2012
AB1919 Amended March 28, 2012
AB1919 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1919 Enrolled September 6, 2012
AB1919 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1919 Amended July 2, 2012
AB1919 Amended June 13, 2012
AB1919 Amended May 10, 2012
AB1919 Amended April 23, 2012
AB1919 Amended March 28, 2012
AB1919 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare