|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 242, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5889.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4445.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5036.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|