California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1922 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 2, 2012