|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4182.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4890.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|