LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1928
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1928
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1928
Compare Versions
AB1928 Chaptered July 13, 2012
AB1928 Enrolled July 2, 2012
AB1928 Amended May 10, 2012
AB1928 Amended April 18, 2012
AB1928 Amended March 20, 2012
AB1928 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1928 Chaptered July 13, 2012
AB1928 Enrolled July 2, 2012
AB1928 Amended May 10, 2012
AB1928 Amended April 18, 2012
AB1928 Amended March 20, 2012
AB1928 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare