|
09/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2488.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1965.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 1236.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|