California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB195 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2011

Amended

Bill July 11, 2011
Bill June 6, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011