|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 4666.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|