California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1970 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012
Bill June 4, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012