08/17/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 175, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/17/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
08/10/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m. | |||
08/06/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/06/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4376.). | |||
07/05/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
07/03/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). | |||
06/25/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/16/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/16/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4373.) | |||
04/10/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28). | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |