BILL NUMBER: AB 1987CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 175 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 17, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 17, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 10, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Davis FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to amend Section 51745 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1987, Davis. Pupil instruction: independent study: leadership course. Existing law authorizes the governing board of a school district or a county office of education to offer independent study to meet the educational needs of pupils. Existing law specifies certain educational opportunities that may be offered through independent study, including, among others, volunteer community service activities that support and strengthen pupil achievement. This bill would include leadership opportunities within the educational opportunities that may be offered through independent study and would make several technical, nonsubstantive changes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51745 of the Education Code is amended to read: 51745. (a) Commencing with the 1990-91 school year, the governing board of a school district or a county office of education may offer independent study to meet the educational needs of pupils in accordance with the requirements of this article. Educational opportunities offered through independent study may include, but shall not be limited to, the following: (1) Special assignments extending the content of regular courses of instruction. (2) Individualized study in a particular area of interest or in a subject not currently available in the regular school curriculum. (3) Individualized alternative education designed to teach the knowledge and skills of the core curriculum. Independent study shall not be provided as an alternative curriculum. (4) Continuing and special study during travel. (5) Volunteer community service activities and leadership opportunities that support and strengthen pupil achievement. (b) Not more than 10 percent of the pupils participating in an opportunity school or program, or a continuation high school, calculated as specified by the department, shall be eligible for apportionment credit for independent study pursuant to this article. A pupil who is pregnant or is a parent who is the primary caregiver for one or more of his or her children shall not be counted within the 10 percent cap. (c) An individual with exceptional needs, as defined in Section 56026, shall not participate in independent study, unless his or her individualized education program developed pursuant to Article 3 (commencing with Section 56340) of Chapter 4 of Part 30 specifically provides for that participation. (d) A temporarily disabled pupil shall not receive individual instruction pursuant to Section 48206.3 through independent study. (e) No course included among the courses required for high school graduation under Section 51225.3 shall be offered exclusively through independent study.