|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 607, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2544.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 1968.).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 904.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|