LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB199
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB199
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB199
Compare Versions
AB199 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB199 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB199 Amended July 12, 2011
AB199 Amended June 28, 2011
AB199 Amended March 17, 2011
AB199 Introduced January 27, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB199 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB199 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB199 Amended July 12, 2011
AB199 Amended June 28, 2011
AB199 Amended March 17, 2011
AB199 Introduced January 27, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare