|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 245, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4472.).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5086.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4973.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|