California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1998 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 12, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012