LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2001
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2001
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2001
Compare Versions
AB2001 Amended July 5, 2012
AB2001 Amended June 20, 2012
AB2001 Amended May 25, 2012
AB2001 Amended May 1, 2012
AB2001 Amended March 28, 2012
AB2001 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2001 Amended July 5, 2012
AB2001 Amended June 20, 2012
AB2001 Amended May 25, 2012
AB2001 Amended May 1, 2012
AB2001 Amended March 28, 2012
AB2001 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare