BILL NUMBER: AB 2001AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 5, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 20, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 1, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bonilla FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to add Section 60604.6 to the Education Code, relating to pupil assessment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2001, as amended, Bonilla. Pupil assessment. The Leroy Greene California Assessment of Academic Achievement Act states the intent of the Legislature to provide a system of individual assessment of pupils that has the primary purpose of assisting teachers, administrators, and pupils and their parents to improve teaching and learning. Existing law establishes the Standardized Testing and Reporting Program pursuant to which each school district, charter school, and county office of education is required to administer to each of its pupils in grades 2 to 11, inclusive, the standards-based achievement tests. These provisions are inoperative on July 1, 2014, and as of January 1, 2015, are repealed. This bill would state the intent of the Legislature that the reauthorization of the statewide pupil assessment program include specified plans to reform that program as it relates to grades 7 to 12, inclusive. The bill would require the Superintendent of Public Instruction, in consultation with various groups of individuals and entities, to develop and present to the State Board of Education, by May 30, 2014, recommendations to effectuate those reforms. The bill would require the state board to adopt, or modify and adopt, the recommendations by September 30, 2014. The bill would require the Superintendent and the state board to present to the Governor and the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature a schedule and implementation plan. The bill would require the State Department of Education to use specified federal funds or any other available and appropriate state and federal funds to implement these provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature that the reauthorization of the statewide pupil assessment program pursuant to Section 60604.5 of the Education Code include both of the following: (a) A plan to bring together elementary and secondary school policy leaders, the community colleges, the California State University, the University of California, private colleges and universities, and postsecondary career technical and vocational programs to develop criteria and create nonpunitive pathways in which assessments taken by middle and high school pupils are aligned with college and career readiness andaremay be recognized as one of a number of multiple measures for entryor placementinto college , placement in college-level courses, and career training. (b) A plan for transitioning to a system of high-quality, nonpunitive assessments that has tangible meaning to individual middle and high school pupils, including, but not limited to, recognition and rewards for demonstrating mastery of subject matter and progress toward mastery of subject matter. SEC. 2. Section 60604.6 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60604.6. (a) For purposes of developing a plan to strengthen the pupil relevance of assessments and to strengthen the alignment between state-mandated middle and high school assessments and the entryor placementrequirements or course placement decisions of public and private colleges and universities and postsecondary career and technical training institutions, the Superintendent, in consultation with the state board, the segments of public and private higher education, career technical and training institutions, administrators of elementary and secondary schools, teachers, members of the governing board of school districts, pupil representatives, and parents, shall develop and recommend to the state board all of the following: (1) Principles among elementary and secondary schools, public and private colleges and universities, and postsecondary career and technical training institutions that would strengthen the alignment of assessments of pupils in grades 7 to 12, inclusive, tothe requirements for entry into college or career opportunities.any of the following: (A) Requirements for entry into college. (B) Placement in college-level courses. (C) Career opportunities. (2) Options for using the results of an individual pupil's grade 11 assessments in core subjects, including, but not limited to, future early assessment programs, to provide assessment performance information to teachers, administrators, parents, and pupils to assist in appropriate placement in courses in grade 12 that lead to stronger college and career-ready preparedness. (3) Options for using grades 7 to 12, inclusive, assessment results in all academic content areas and English language proficiency to determine an appropriate instructional program and course placement for English learners so English learners may access appropriate and rigorous grade-level content that meets their academic and language needs to successfully graduate from high school and become college and career ready. (4) A plan and timeline to expand and strengthen future early assessment programs to provide information to postsecondary institutions, secondary schools, and pupils about pupil preparedness for all California public institutions of postsecondary education, including the community colleges, the California State University, the University of California, private colleges and universities, and postsecondary career training institutions. (b) For purposes of developing a plan to make statewide assessments more meaningful to pupils in grades 7 to 12, inclusive, the Superintendent, in consultation with the state board, administrators, teachers, members of the governing board of school districts, pupil representatives, and parents, shall recommend multiple methods to provide for pupil recognition, reward, and incentives that a local educational agency may adopt. These options may include, but shall not be limited to, the following: (1) Assessment performance as one component of a pupil's academic transcript if requested by a pupil or his or her parent or guardian. (2) Assessment performance as one component of a final course grade or course passage as determined by the teacher if the course substantially aligns with the grade level content standards assessed. (3) Assessment performance as one criterion for eligibility for merit-based scholarships, recognition programs, and internship opportunities. (4) Notwithstanding Section 60615, assessment performance on an equivalent or more rigorous examination may be used to exempt a pupil from taking a comparable subject matter statewide assessment to the extent permitted by federal law. (5) The right of a pupil to be exempted from other required statewide assessments if equivalent or more rigorous exams are taken and equivalent or sufficiently comparable subject matter proficiency is shown. (6) Making future early assessment programs available to all pupils at all schools. (c) The Superintendent shall present recommendations to the state board on or before May 30, 2014. After the Superintendent presents the recommendations, two public hearings shall be held during regularly scheduled state board meetings to ensure public input and participation. (d) On or before September 30, 2014, the state board shall adopt, or modify and adopt, the recommendations. (e) The Superintendent and the state board shall present to the Governor and the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature a schedule and implementation plan that meets the intent of this section. (f) The department shall use funds received pursuant to Title VI of the federal No Child Left Behind Act of 2001 (20 U.S.C. Sec. 6301 et seq.), or any other available and appropriate state and federal funds to implement this section.