|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 5890.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 4437.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 4563.)
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 16).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|