California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2006 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/07/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2006CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 246 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 9, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 13, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 11, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member John A. Prez FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to add Section 14800.1 to the Financial Code, relating to credit unions. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2006, John A. Prez. Credit union services. Existing law prohibits an officer, director, committee member, or employee of a credit union from extending any benefit or service of the credit union to any person, unless that person is admitted to membership in the credit union. Existing law also prohibits a credit union from creating any obligation with a person who is not admitted to membership in the credit union, except as specified. A knowing or willful violation of these provisions is a crime, as specified. This bill would authorize a credit union to sell, to a natural person in the field of membership, regardless of whether the person is admitted to membership, checks, as defined, and other similar money transfer instruments, including domestic and international electronic funds transfers. The bill would authorize a credit union to cash checks and other similar money transfer instruments and to receive international and domestic electronic fund transfers for those persons. The bill would also authorize a credit union to charge a fee for providing these services, not to exceed the cost of providing the services. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14800.1 is added to the Financial Code, to read: 14800.1. (a) Notwithstanding subdivision (b) of Section 14800 or Section 14750, a credit union may do all of the following: (1) Provide the services specified in paragraph (2) to a natural person within the field of membership, regardless of whether the person is admitted to membership, and charge a fee for the provision of those services, which fee shall not exceed the cost to provide those services. (2) (A) Sell checks and other similar money transfer instruments, including international and domestic electronic fund transfers. (B) Cash checks and other similar money transfer instruments and receive international and domestic electronic fund transfers. (b) For purposes of this section, "checks" shall have the same meaning as set forth in subdivision (f) of Section 3104 of the Commercial Code.