California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill April 18, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012