LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2019
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2019
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2019
Compare Versions
AB2019 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB2019 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB2019 Amended August 7, 2012
AB2019 Amended April 18, 2012
AB2019 Amended March 29, 2012
AB2019 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2019 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB2019 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB2019 Amended August 7, 2012
AB2019 Amended April 18, 2012
AB2019 Amended March 29, 2012
AB2019 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare