|
09/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 6613.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6468.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4701.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4569.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|