California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2080 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 14, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012