California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2115 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Amended

Bill May 31, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012