California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2115 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/16/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2115ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 9, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 13, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 10, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Alejo FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to amend Section 32121.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to local health care districts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2115, Alejo. Local health care districts: employment contracts. Existing law, the Local Health Care District Law, regulates local health care districts and authorizes the health care districts to exercise specified powers. Existing law authorizes a local health care district to enter into an employment contract with a hospital administrator. This bill would require a local health care district, if it employs or contracts for a hospital administrator or chief executive officer, to enter into a written employment contract with the hospital administrator or chief executive officer, thereby imposing a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 32121.5 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 32121.5. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of this division, a local health care district may enter into a contract of employment with a hospital administrator or chief executive officer. (b) If a local health care district employs or contracts for a hospital administrator or chief executive officer pursuant to subdivision (a), the district shall enter into a written employment agreement with the hospital administrator or chief executive officer, not to exceed four years, but which may periodically be renewed for not more than four years. SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.