|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 8. Page 6756.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5049.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 4984.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 4452.)
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|