LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2122
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2122
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2122
Compare Versions
AB2122 Chaptered September 26, 2012
AB2122 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2122 Amended August 29, 2012
AB2122 Amended August 24, 2012
AB2122 Amended June 26, 2012
AB2122 Amended June 13, 2012
AB2122 Amended March 21, 2012
AB2122 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2122 Chaptered September 26, 2012
AB2122 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2122 Amended August 29, 2012
AB2122 Amended August 24, 2012
AB2122 Amended June 26, 2012
AB2122 Amended June 13, 2012
AB2122 Amended March 21, 2012
AB2122 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare