|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5125.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|